Global patent index - EP 0996349 A2

EP 0996349 A2 2000-05-03 - BEARING ELEMENT FOR UPHOLSTERY SUPPORT FOR A SEAT OR BED SYSTEM

Title (en)

BEARING ELEMENT FOR UPHOLSTERY SUPPORT FOR A SEAT OR BED SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUFLAGEELEMENT FÜR POLSTERUNTERLAGE VON SITZ- ODER LIEGEFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT D'APPUI POUR LA BASE DE COUSSIN DE SURFACES DE SIEGE OU DE LIT

Publication

EP 0996349 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98940235 A

Priority

  • DE 29712720 U
  • DE 29712721 U
  • DE 29721655 U
  • EP 9804420 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6477727B1] The invention relates to a bearing element having a base plate fitted on a support, for a seat or bed system, with a bearing plate to hold upholstery. The invention seeks to produce a bearing element whose range of spring is approximately equal to the total height, and which is easy to produce. To this end, at least two spring elements serving as bearing arms (12, 22) are fitted between the base plate (11, 21) and the bearing plate (15, 25). These spring elements, configured like leaf springs, are directed outwards from the base plate (11, 21). Their outer ends join the hearing plate (15, 25). In another version of the invention, a spring body (35, 35') is fitted between the base and bearing plate. The spring body head (35.2) and foot (35.1), like the bearing plate and base plate, have corresponding locking parts, so that the bearing plate can also be removably placed on the spring body (15, 15') and on the base plate (21). The invention also seeks to provide a bed system that is fitted with the inventive bearing elements, and which is characterized by its versatility. To this effect, fixing means for bearing elements are fitted on the plate or laths, preferably as undercrosses (30) that can be connected by socket connectors, with fixing means for the bearing element (10, 20) in the crossing area. A second version of the invention is intended in particular for lath frames (2) with mountable frame part(s) (3, 5, 7). In this version, at least one row of bearing elements (30') belonging to the outer mountable frame part is fitted with bearing elements (35') having a foot support (31) and a bearing plate (20, 40, 50). The other rows have bearing elements (30), which comprise a foot support (31), spring body (35, 35') and bearing plate (20, 40, 50).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/04 (2006.01); A47C 23/00 (2006.01); F16F 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903379A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6477727 B1 20021112; AT 208580 T 20011115; AU 741449 B2 20011129; AU 8862198 A 19990210; CA 2297086 A1 19990128; CA 2297086 C 20070109; CZ 20000179 A3 20011212; CZ 292929 B6 20040114; DE 29712720 U1 19980910; DE 29712721 U1 19980910; DE 29721655 U1 19990121; DE 59802156 D1 20011220; DK 0996349 T3 20020225; EP 0996349 A2 20000503; EP 0996349 B1 20011114; ES 2167920 T3 20020516; IL 134048 D0 20010430; JP 2001510060 A 20010731; JP 3708435 B2 20051019; PL 190480 B1 20051230; PL 338038 A1 20000925; PT 996349 E 20020429; WO 9903379 A2 19990128; WO 9903379 A3 19990415

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140117

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130718

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-01-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140117

2013-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FROLI KUNSTSTOFFWERK HEINRICH FROMME, INH. MAR, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59802156

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-01-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59802156

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE MELDAU - STRAUSS - FLOETOTTO, DE

- Effective date: 20121204

2012-12-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59802156

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE MELDAU - STRAUSS - FLOETOTTO, DE

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FROLI KUNSTSTOFFWERK HEINRICH FROMME OHG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-02-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1029721

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2167920

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-02-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802156

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-20

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 208580

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010307

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990915

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE