Global Patent Index - EP 0996437 A1

EP 0996437 A1 2000-05-03 - SEMISOLID PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION CONTAINING DEXKETOPROFEN TROMETAMOL

Title (en)

SEMISOLID PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION CONTAINING DEXKETOPROFEN TROMETAMOL

Title (de)

HALBFESTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND DEXKETOPROFEN-TROMETAMOL

Title (fr)

FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE SEMI-SOLIDE CONTENANT DU DEXKETOPROFENE TROMETAMOL$i()

Publication

EP 0996437 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937444 A

Priority

  • EP 9803333 W
  • ES 9701213 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855113A1] The present invention relates to a process for the preparation of a semisolid pharmaceutical formulation (gel or cream) containing dexketoprofen trometamol and different amines as neutralizing agents, for the topical treatment of inflammatory processes in humans. The pharmaceutical formulations object of the present invention show advantages deriving from their high storage stability without noticeable changes in the appearance of the product in time, as well as from their lower allergenic and photoallergenic activities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/19; A61K 47/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 47/18 (2006.01); A61K 47/32 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/32 (2013.01); A61K 9/0014 (2013.01); A61K 31/192 (2013.01); A61K 47/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855113A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855113 A1 19981210; AT 201137 T 20010615; AU 728442 B2 20010111; AU 8624498 A 19981221; BG 103926 A 20000929; BG 64299 B1 20040930; BR 9810072 A 20000919; BR 9810072 B1 20100713; CA 2293589 A1 19981210; CA 2293589 C 20080122; CN 1195510 C 20050406; CN 1259048 A 20000705; CU 22866 A3 20030813; CZ 290118 B6 20020612; CZ 9904313 A3 20000517; DE 69800804 D1 20010621; DE 69800804 T2 20010913; DK 0996437 T3 20010806; EA 002026 B1 20011224; EC SP014108 A 20020225; EE 03905 B1 20021216; EE 9900556 A 20000615; EP 0996437 A1 20000503; EP 0996437 B1 20010516; ES 2124196 A1 19990116; ES 2124196 B1 19991201; ES 2156446 T3 20010616; GR 3036319 T3 20011130; HK 1027753 A1 20010817; HN 2001000137 A 20011029; HU 0002734 A2 20010129; HU 0002734 A3 20030528; HU 226686 B1 20090629; ID 26240 A 20001207; JP 2002502407 A 20020122; KR 100543558 B1 20060120; KR 20010013320 A 20010226; NZ 501487 A 20010629; PL 190779 B1 20060131; PL 337156 A1 20000731; PT 996437 E 20010928; SK 164999 A3 20000912; SK 284317 B6 20050103; TR 9903018 T2 20000522

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800804

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-06-21

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156446

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HUG INTERLIZENZ AG

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19991201;LV PAYMENT 19991201;RO PAYMENT 19991201

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 201137

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MAULEON CASELLAS, DAVID

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PALOMER BENET, ALBERT

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GARCIA PEREZ, LUISA

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/192 A, 7A 61K 47/18 B

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991201

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19991201;LV PAYMENT 19991201;RO PAYMENT 19991201