Global Patent Index - EP 0996441 A1

EP 0996441 A1 2000-05-03 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF ARGLABIN AND ARGLABIN DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF ARGLABIN AND ARGLABIN DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON ARGLABIN UND ARGLABIN DERIVATE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONSTITUEES D'ARGLABINE ET DE DERIVES D'ARGLABINE

Publication

EP 0996441 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918509 A

Priority

  • KZ 970397 A
  • US 5168197 P
  • US 93422897 A
  • US 93422997 A
  • US 93447197 A
  • US 9807989 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848789A1] Pharmaceutical compositions containing arglabin and arglabin derivatives are described. The compositions can be in unit dosage form and are useful for the treatment of cancer in humans. Compositions and kits containing a first chemotherapeutic agent that includes arglabin or a derivative thereof and a second chemotherapeutic agent are also described. The compositions and kits are effective for treating cancer in a human patient. The invention also provides various derivatives of arglabin, effective for suppressing tumor growth in mammals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/34; A61K 31/28; A61K 31/35; A61K 31/505; A61K 31/56; A61K 31/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/343 (2006.01); A61K 31/365 (2006.01); A61K 31/475 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61K 31/675 (2006.01); A61K 33/24 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 307/93 (2006.01); C07D 493/04 (2006.01); C07D 493/10 (2006.01); C07D 493/14 (2006.01); C07D 493/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 493/04 (2013.01); A61K 31/343 (2013.01); A61K 31/365 (2013.01); A61K 31/475 (2013.01); A61K 31/505 (2013.01); A61K 31/5377 (2013.01); A61K 31/675 (2013.01); A61K 33/24 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); C07D 307/93 (2013.01); C07D 493/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/70 + A61K 31/365
  2. A61K 33/24 + A61K 31/365
  3. A61K 31/675 + A61K 31/475 + A61K 31/365
  4. A61K 31/505 + A61K 31/365
  5. A61K 31/475 + A61K 31/365
  6. A61K 31/365 + A61K 31/17
  7. A61K 31/365 + A61K 2300/00
  8. A61K 31/475 + A61K 2300/00
  9. A61K 31/505 + A61K 2300/00
  10. A61K 31/675 + A61K 2300/00
  11. A61K 33/24 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848789 A1 19981105; AU 7141898 A 19981124; CA 2287318 A1 19981105; EP 0996441 A1 20000503; EP 0996441 A4 20020807; JP 2002509532 A 20020326; JP 3507511 B2 20040315

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060124

2006-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ADEKENOV, SERGAZY M.

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2002-08-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/34 A, 7A 61K 31/70 B, 7A 61K 31/56 B, 7A 61K 31/505 B, 7A 61K 31/35 B, 7A 61K 31/28 B, 7A 61K 31/365 B, 7A 61K 31/475 B, 7C 07D 307/93 B, 7C 07D 493/04 B, 7C 07D 493/10 B, 7C 07D 493/20 B

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE