Global Patent Index - EP 0996457 A1

EP 0996457 A1 2000-05-03 - FSH-RELEASING PEPTIDES

Title (en)

FSH-RELEASING PEPTIDES

Title (de)

FSH FREISETZENDE PEPTIDE

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES LIBERATEURS DE F.S.H.

Publication

EP 0996457 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926280 A

Priority

  • US 9811512 W
  • US 86915397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855136A1] Lamprey LHRH-III is a potent FSH-releasing factor, and may be used to enhance fertility. Antagonists to lamprey LHRH-III may be used to inhibit fertility.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/04 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61P 5/06 (2006.01); A61P 5/08 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/08 (2006.01); C07K 7/23 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/575 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8257 (2013.01); A61K 38/09 (2013.01); C07K 7/23 (2013.01); C07K 14/43563 (2013.01); C07K 14/575 (2013.01); C07K 19/00 (2013.01); C12N 15/8242 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855136 A1 19981210; CA 2293664 A1 19981210; EP 0996457 A1 20000503; EP 0996457 A4 20010919; JP 2000513749 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031203

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020422

2001-09-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 38/08 A, 7C 07K 7/23 B

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE