Global Patent Index - EP 0996487 A1

EP 0996487 A1 2000-05-03 - FALL PREVENTION DEVICE AND AUXILIARY DEVICE FOR CLIMBING

Title (en)

FALL PREVENTION DEVICE AND AUXILIARY DEVICE FOR CLIMBING

Title (de)

ABSTURZSICHERUNG UND KLETTERHILFE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ANTI-CHUTE SERVANT D'ASSISTANCE POUR GRIMPER

Publication

EP 0996487 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934507 A

Priority

  • DE 9901473 W
  • DE 29808850 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19922460A1] A holding rope (HS) has its two ends fixed to first (BF1) and second (BF2) fixtures and then to the safety harness. A connecting component (V) has first and second rope enclosures (O1,O2), which are not in a sector of the periphery of the mast, tree or similar facing the person directly. The holding rope starting from the first fixture on the safety harness is fed firstly backwards, then at least with a part of its thickness through the first rope enclosure of the connecting component, forwards along an essential part of the periphery of the mast, tree or similar around it to a great extent, and then through the second rope enclosure forward to the second fixture on the safety harness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/00 (2006.01); A63B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/0075 (2013.01); A63B 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959682A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908404 U1 19990812; AU 5026199 A 19991206; DE 19922460 A1 19991118; EP 0996487 A1 20000503; WO 9959682 A2 19991125; WO 9959682 A3 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050628

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050217

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000902

2000-08-23 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE