Global Patent Index - EP 0996516 A1

EP 0996516 A1 2000-05-03 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WORKPIECES OR BLOCKS FROM MELTABLE MATERIALS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WORKPIECES OR BLOCKS FROM MELTABLE MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WERKSTÜCKEN ODER BLÖCKEN AUS SCHMELZBAREN MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION DE PIECES OU DE BLOCS EN MATERIAUX FUSIBLES

Publication

EP 0996516 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943727 A

Priority

  • DE 19730378 A
  • EP 9804351 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19831388A1] A liquid material in a heatable mould is solidified in an oriented manner using of a cooling unit. To control the motion of the solidification front, a cooling structure with at least one heat conduction element is introduced from below into at least one opening in a block (13) next to the mould base. The apparatus includes a cooling unit with a cooling structure (25) with at least one heat conduction element (10) which can be introduced using a drive mechanism (18) into at least one opening (17, 13a) in the block (13) next to the mould base.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 27/04 (2006.01); B28B 1/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 27/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903621A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831388 A1 19990121; EP 0996516 A1 20000503; EP 0996516 B1 20010829; JP 2001510095 A 20010731; US 6464198 B1 20021015; WO 9903621 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110715

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110714

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110714

2012-03-06 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-02-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20100729

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-29 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ERR

- Free Format Text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 02/04 PAGES: 246 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2005-04-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-02-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2002-01-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011210

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-11-21 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801335

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-04

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991021

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE