Global Patent Index - EP 0996517 B1

EP 0996517 B1 2001-04-18 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE MOVEMENT OF A TEEMING LADLE HAVING A LOW TEEMING HEIGHT IN A TEEMING INSTALLATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE MOVEMENT OF A TEEMING LADLE HAVING A LOW TEEMING HEIGHT IN A TEEMING INSTALLATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEWEGUNGSSTEUERUNG EINER GIESSPFANNE MIT GERINGER GIESSHÖHE IN EINER GIESSANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA COMMANDE DU DEPLACEMENT D'UNE POCHE DE COULEE A FAIBLE HAUTEUR DE COULEE DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE COULEE

Publication

EP 0996517 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98923971 A

Priority

  • CH 9800261 W
  • CH 155497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900205A1] The invention relates to a teeming method according to which the teeming ladle is moved relatively horizontally in direction X and vertically in direction Y and pivoted about an axis of rotation A. During automatic teeming this makes it possible to constantly keep the theoretical point of rotation of the spout, around which point the teeming ladle is pivoted while keeping a safe distance between the teeming ladle and the teeming mould, at its lowest possible level.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 39/00 (2006.01); B22D 41/04 (2006.01); B22D 41/06 (2006.01); B22D 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/04 (2013.01); B22D 39/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900205 A1 19990107; AT 200639 T 20010515; AU 7635098 A 19990119; BR 9810940 A 20000926; CA 2292650 A1 19990107; CA 2292650 C 20051025; CN 1080154 C 20020306; CN 1261830 A 20000802; DE 59800642 C5 20100610; DE 59800642 D1 20010523; DK 0996517 T3 20010702; EP 0996517 A1 20000503; EP 0996517 B1 20010418; ES 2158683 T3 20010901; JP 2001507631 A 20010612; JP 3329834 B2 20020930; KR 100369645 B1 20030130; PT 996517 E 20010830; US 6619371 B1 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-12-31 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: HUBO ENGINEERING GMBH;KOSTHOFENSTRASSE 2;3266 WILER B. SEEDORF (CH)

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080618

2010-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2010-04-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20100310

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090701

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-13 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2009-11-13 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080618

2009-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-08-31 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20090622

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080618

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-02-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081217

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081217

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-18 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-07 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158683 T3

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-07-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800642 20010523

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2001-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200639 T 20010515

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI PT SE