Global Patent Index - EP 0996527 A1

EP 0996527 A1 2000-05-03 - SLITTER WITH ITS OWN SUSPENSION FOR LONGITUDINAL CUTTING MACHINES WITH SCISSORS CUTTING

Title (en)

SLITTER WITH ITS OWN SUSPENSION FOR LONGITUDINAL CUTTING MACHINES WITH SCISSORS CUTTING

Title (de)

SELBSTFEDERNDES KREISMESSER FÜR SCHERENSCHNITT-LÄNGSSCHNEIDEMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

COUTEAU CIRCULAIRE A SUSPENSION PROPRE POUR MACHINES DE COUPE LONGITUDINALE A COUPE AUX CISEAUX

Publication

EP 0996527 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943672 A

Priority

  • DE 9801945 W
  • DE 19730815 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830481A1] The cutter blade has a centre opening for fitting on a cutter holder. Spring arms (18) are formed in an area of the cutter blade between the centre opening and cutting edge (11) through incisions (14,15) which pass through the material thickness of the blade. The incisions and the spring arms extend in a circumferential direction of the blade. The incisions can be provided on several circumferential lines at different radii, and can be off-set relative to each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/14 (2006.01); B26D 1/00 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/2621 (2013.01); B26D 1/0006 (2013.01); B26D 2001/002 (2013.01); B26D 2001/0046 (2013.01); B26D 2001/006 (2013.01); B26D 2001/0066 (2013.01); B26D 2007/2685 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903654A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830481 A1 19990121; AU 9152198 A 19990210; DE 19730815 C1 19981126; EP 0996527 A1 20000503; EP 0996527 B1 20010411; JP 2001510100 A 20010731; JP 4243748 B2 20090325; WO 9903654 A1 19990128; WO 9903654 A9 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160707

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800634

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800634 20010517

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT