Global Patent Index - EP 0996586 A1

EP 0996586 A1 2000-05-03 - METHOD FOR SUPPLYING PRINTING MACHINES WITH PRINTING INK

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SUPPLYING PRINTING MACHINES WITH PRINTING INK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERSORGEN VON DRUCKMASCHINEN MIT DRUCKFARBEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ALIMENTER DES MACHINES A IMPRIMER EN ENCRES

Publication

EP 0996586 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942482 A

Priority

  • DE 9801823 W
  • DE 19731601 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19731601A1] The invention relates to a method for supplying printing machines with printing ink or other similar colored chemical products in which the printing ink or the colored products can be delivered to an ink duct by means of an arrangement for dispensing high viscous media. The forwarded material is placed inside of a flexible plastic receptacle provided with a formed screw socket. The method provides that a) the pressure vessel (3) is configured as a piston-cylinder unit, b) the plastic receptacle (1) has a circular cylindrical shape such that the outer diameter of said plastic container fits within the inner diameter of the pressure vessel (3), c) a ring-shaped free space is produced in the outer foredge between the front of the plastic receptacle (1) and the cylinder cover (9) or the piston area of the main piston (6), and d) the plastic receptacle (1) inserted inside of the working area of the piston-cylinder unit can be axially compressed by the piston (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/02; B41F 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2006.01); B67D 7/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/0216 (2013.01); B41F 31/08 (2013.01); B67D 7/0227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903777A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19731601 A1 19990121; EP 0996586 A1 20000503; WO 9903777 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010129

2000-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-08-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR SUPPLYING PRINTING MACHINES WITH INK AND DEVICE THERE FOR

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR SUPPLYING PRINTING MACHINES WITH INK AND DEVICE THERE FOR

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT