Global patent index - EP 0996623 A1

EP 0996623 A1 2000-05-03 - 2,6-DI-t-BUTYL-4- (DIMETHYL-4-METHOXYPHENYLSILYL) -METHYLOXY PHENOL AND 2,6-DI-t-BUTYL-4- (DIMETHYL-2-METHOXY-PHENYLSILYL) -METHYLOXY PHENOL

Title (en)

2,6-DI-t-BUTYL-4- (DIMETHYL-4-METHOXYPHENYLSILYL) -METHYLOXY PHENOL AND 2,6-DI-t-BUTYL-4- (DIMETHYL-2-METHOXY-PHENYLSILYL) -METHYLOXY PHENOL

Title (de)

2,6-DI-T-BUTYL4-¬(DIMETHYL-4-METHOXYPHENYLSILYL)-METHYLOXY PHENOL UND 2,6-DI-T-BUTYL-4-¬(DIMETHYL-2-METHOXY-PHENYLSILYL)-METHYLOXY PHENOL

Title (fr)

2,6-DI-t-Butyl-4- (DIMETHYL-4-METHOXYPHENYLSILYL) -METHYL-OXY PHENOL ET 2,6-DI-t-BUTYL-4- (DIMETHYL-2-METHOXY-PHENYLSILYL) -METHYLOXY PHENOL

Publication

EP 0996623 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923645 A

Priority

  • US 9810443 W
  • US 88184397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858937A1] This invention relates to the compounds of 2,6-di-t-butyl-4- [(dimethyl-4- methoxyphenylsilyl)-methyloxy]phenol and 2,6-di-t-butyl-4-[(dimethyl-2-methoxyphenylsilyl)methyloxy]phenol, polymorphs thereof and their pharmaceutically acceptable salts, useful as antiatherosclerotic agents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 7/08; A61K 31/695

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/695 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); C07F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 7/0812 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858937A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858937 A1 19981230; AR 013115 A1 20001213; AU 7588498 A 19990104; CA 2295232 A1 19981230; EP 0996623 A1 20000503; JP 2002506443 A 20020226; ZA 9805324 B 19990107

INPADOC legal status

2007-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: 2,6-DI-T-BUTYL-4- (DIMETHYL-4-METHOXYPHENYLSILYL) -METHYLOXY PHENOL AND 2,6-DI-T-BUTYL-4- (DIMETHYL-2-METHOXY-PHENYLSILYL) -METHYLOXY PHENOL

2006-12-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1029792

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020320

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE