Global Patent Index - EP 0996634 A1

EP 0996634 A1 2000-05-03 - CRYSTAL OF SM3 ANTIBODY (FRAGMENT) AND RECOGNIZING EPITOPE, ITS PREPARATION, ENCODED DATA STORAGE MEDIUM CONTAINING ITS COORDINATES AND ITS DIAGNOSTICAL OR MEDICAL USE

Title (en)

CRYSTAL OF SM3 ANTIBODY (FRAGMENT) AND RECOGNIZING EPITOPE, ITS PREPARATION, ENCODED DATA STORAGE MEDIUM CONTAINING ITS COORDINATES AND ITS DIAGNOSTICAL OR MEDICAL USE

Title (de)

KRISTALL, WELCHES SM3 ANTIKÖRPER (FRAGMENTE) UND DESSEN EPITOP UMFASST, DESSEN HERSTELLUNG, DESSEN KOORDINATE ENTHALTENDES DATENSPEICHERSYSTEM UND DESSEN DIAGNOSTISCHE ODER MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

CRISTAL DE L'ANTICORPS SM3 (FRAGMENT) ET DE L'EPITOPE DE RECONNAISSANCE, SA PREPARATION, SUPPORT DE DONNEES CODEES CONTENANT SES COORDONNEES ET SON UTILISATION DIAGNOSTIQUE OU MEDICALE

Publication

EP 0996634 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940371 A

Priority

  • GB 9802542 W
  • GB 9717946 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910379A1] A process for preparing a crystal using cadmium. Structure factors or structural coordinates obtained from the crystal of SM3 antibody bound to an epitope can be used to design mimics of the antibody or epitope. Such mimics can be used in the diagnosis or therapy of cancer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47; A61K 38/17; A61K 39/395; C07K 16/18; G01N 33/68; G06F 17/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); G06F 17/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4727 (2013.01); C07K 16/18 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910379A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910379 A1 19990304; AU 751386 B2 20020815; AU 8871198 A 19990316; CA 2300370 A1 19990304; EP 0996634 A1 20000503; GB 9717946 D0 19971029; IL 134547 D0 20010430; JP 2001514188 A 20010911; NO 20000845 A 20000425; NO 20000845 D0 20000221

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040429

2003-10-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANCER RESEARCH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANCER RESEARCH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FREEMONT, PAUL SIMON

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SNARY, DAVID

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STERNBERG, MICHAEL JOSEPH EZRA

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BATES, PAUL ALAN

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DOKURNO, PAWEL C/O INSTITUTE OF CANCER RESEARCH

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE