Global Patent Index - EP 0996635 A1

EP 0996635 A1 2000-05-03 - NOVEL FAMILY OF PHEROMONE RECEPTORS

Title (en)

NOVEL FAMILY OF PHEROMONE RECEPTORS

Title (de)

NEUARTIGE FAMILIE VON PHEROMONREZEPTOREN

Title (fr)

NOUVELLE FAMILLE DE RECEPTEURS DE PHEROMONES

Publication

EP 0996635 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933045 A

Priority

  • US 9813680 W
  • US 5128497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900422A1] The invention describes a multigene family encoding a collection of novel mammalian pheromone receptors. Nucleic acids encoding the pheromone receptor polypeptides, including fragments and biologically functional variants thereof are provided. Also included are polypeptides and fragments thereof encoded by such nucleic acids, and antibodies relating thereto. Methods and products for using such nucleic acids and polypeptides also are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; A61K 38/17; C12N 15/12; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); C07K 1/16 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6809 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900422 A1 19990107; WO 9900422 A9 19990415; CA 2294473 A1 19990107; EP 0996635 A1 20000503; EP 0996635 A4 20030827; JP 2002511871 A 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001104

2003-08-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/705 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/12 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/10 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/62 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/28 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 B

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUCK,LINDA

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DULAC, CATHERINE

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERRADA, GILLES

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATSUNAMI, HIROAKI

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUCK,LINDA

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DULAC, CATHERINE

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERRADA, GILLES

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATSUNAMI, HIROAKI

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE