Global Patent Index - EP 0996742 A1

EP 0996742 A1 2000-05-03 - METHODS FOR CLEAVING DNA WITH NUCLEOTIDE INTEGRASES

Title (en)

METHODS FOR CLEAVING DNA WITH NUCLEOTIDE INTEGRASES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SPALTUNG VON DNA MITTELS NUKLEOTID-INTEGRASEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CLIVAGE D'ADN AU MOYEN D'INTEGRASES NUCLEOTIDIQUES

Publication

EP 0996742 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908823 A

Priority

  • US 9803990 W
  • US 3922097 P
  • US 7616198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2282737A1] The present invention provides methods, using a nucleotide integrase, for cleaving nucleic acids substrates at specific sites and inserting a nucleic acid molecule into the cleaved substrate. The method of cleaving one strand of a double-stranded DNA substrate comprises providing a nucleotide integrase comprising a group II-intron RNA having two hybridizing sequences capable of hybridizing with two intron RNA binding sequences on the one strand of the substrate and a group II-intron encoded protein which binds to a first sequence element of the substrate. The method of cleaving both strands of a double-stranded DNA substrate comprises providing a nucleotide integrase comprising a group II-intron RNA having two hybridizing sequences capable of hybridizing with two intron RNA binding sequences on one strand of the substrate and a group II-intron encoded protein capable of binding to first and second sequence elements in the recognition site of the substrate. The method of cleaving a single-stranded nucleic acid substrate comprises providing an integrase having two hybridizing sequences capable of hybridizing with two intron RNA-binding sequences of the substrate and a group II-intron encoded protein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/10 (2013.01); C12Q 1/683 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C12Q 1/683 + C12Q 2522/101 + C12Q 2521/301

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 6676298 A 19980918; AU 748237 B2 20020530; CA 2282737 A1 19980903; EP 0996742 A1 20000503; EP 0996742 A4 20060208

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080204

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-02-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20051228

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LAMBOWITZ, ALAN, M.

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZIMMERLY, STEVE

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUO, HUATAO

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MOHR, GEORG

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BEAL, CLIFFORD, J.

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990819

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE