Global patent index - EP 0996748 A1

EP 0996748 A1 2000-05-03 - PIVOTING DEVICE WITH ARM AND CONTROL ROD

Title (en)

PIVOTING DEVICE WITH ARM AND CONTROL ROD

Title (de)

SCHWENKVORRICHTUNG MIT AUSLEGER UND STEUERSTANGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PIVOTEMENT A BRAS ET TIGE DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 0996748 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939597 A

Priority

  • EP 9804064 W
  • LU 90089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902738A1] This invention relates to a pivoting device for supporting a working means (16) and comprising a load-bearing structure (18), an arm (20) and a control rod (30). A first end of the arm (20) is pivotably mounted in the load-bearing structure (18). The working means (16) is pivotably connected to the second end of the arm (20). A first end of the control rod (30) is hinged to the pivoting working means (16). A hinged quadrangle (34) acts as a pivot point for the second end of the control rod (30). This quadrangle encompasses the load-bearing structure (18) acting as a chassis, the arm (20) acting as a driven element, as well as two coupling elements (36, 40) which close said quadrangle (34). The control rod is hinged, by its second end, to one of the two coupling elements (36, 40). When the arm pivots (20), the pivot point of the second end of the control rod (30) remains on the same side of the arm (20), so that the control rod (30) does not cross the arm (20) during pivoting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902738A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902738 A1 19990121; AT 210737 T 20011215; AU 8805198 A 19990208; BR 9810573 A 20000919; DE 59802455 D1 20020124; EP 0996748 A1 20000503; EP 0996748 B1 20011212; LU 90089 A2 19990111; US 6251338 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 210737

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802455

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-02-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1027600

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802455

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-24

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 210737

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010329

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT