Global Patent Index - EP 0996757 A1

EP 0996757 A1 2000-05-03 - TITANIUM BASED CARBONITRIDE ALLOY WITH NITRIDED SURFACE ZONE

Title (en)

TITANIUM BASED CARBONITRIDE ALLOY WITH NITRIDED SURFACE ZONE

Title (de)

KARBONNITRIDLEGIERUNG AUF TITANBASIS MIT NITRIERTER OBERFLÄCHENZONE

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE DE CARBONITRURE A BASE DE TITANE, COMPORTANT UNE ZONE SUPERFICIELLE NITRUREE

Publication

EP 0996757 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923278 A

Priority

  • SE 9800910 W
  • SE 9701859 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851831A1] According to the present invention an uncoated titanium based carbonitride cutting tool insert with superior plastic deformation resistance and wear resistance is provided. This is accomplished by heat treating the material in nitrogen atmosphere under conditions to obtain a nitrogen rich surface zone, also containing substantial amounts of binder phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 27/14 (2006.01); B22F 3/10 (2006.01); C22C 1/05 (2006.01); C22C 29/04 (2006.01); C23C 8/20 (2006.01); C23C 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 29/04 (2013.01); C23C 8/20 (2013.01); C23C 30/005 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/00 + B22F 2207/03
  2. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/1035 + B22F 3/24
  3. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/24 + B22F 2201/02

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851831A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851831 A1 19981119; AT 228175 T 20021215; DE 69809555 D1 20030102; DE 69809555 T2 20030327; EP 0996757 A1 20000503; EP 0996757 B1 20021120; IL 132346 A 20030410; IL 132346 D0 20010319; JP 2001524886 A 20011204; JP 4170402 B2 20081022; SE 9701859 D0 19970515

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100515

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100515

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100516

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-02-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100515

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100515

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090511

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090512

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AB

- Free text: SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY HB##811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE) -TRANSFER TO- SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AB##811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE)

2005-11-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY HB

- Free text: SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG##811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE) -TRANSFER TO- SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY HB##811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE)

2005-07-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809555 20030102

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228175 T 20021215

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011024

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE