Global Patent Index - EP 0996770 A1

EP 0996770 A1 2000-05-03 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATING METAL SURFACES BY DRY PROCESS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATING METAL SURFACES BY DRY PROCESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTING ZUR TROCKENBEHANDLUNG VON METALLOBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES METALLIQUES PAR VOIE SECHE

Publication

EP 0996770 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99914612 A

Priority

  • FR 9900916 W
  • FR 9805603 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778190A1] The invention concerns a dry process surface treatment method for treating at least a metal surface portion, wherein the portion is treated at a pressure close to atmospheric pressure with a treating gas stream comprising excited and unstable species, which consists in locally increasing the treating gas pressure on the metal surface portion so as to force the l species to move along a direction substantially perpendicular to the surface. The invention is useful for wave brazing electronic components on printed circuit wafers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23G 5/00; B23K 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 1/20 (2006.01); C23F 4/00 (2006.01); C23G 5/00 (2006.01); H05K 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23G 5/00 (2013.01); B23K 1/206 (2013.01); B23K 2201/42 (2013.01); H05K 3/3489 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957334A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778190 A1 19991105; FR 2778190 B1 20000602; BR 9906414 A 20000711; CA 2293610 A1 19991111; CN 1266463 A 20000913; EP 0996770 A1 20000503; ID 24519 A 20000720; JP 2002509583 A 20020326; TW 548346 B 20030821; WO 9957334 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020701

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE