Global Patent Index - EP 0996773 A1

EP 0996773 A1 2000-05-03 - A DRAINED CATHODE CELL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ALUMINIUM

Title (en)

A DRAINED CATHODE CELL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ALUMINIUM

Title (de)

ZELL FÜR ALUMINIUM-HERSTELLUNG MIT DRAINIERFÄHIGE KATHODE

Title (fr)

CELLULE A CATHODE DRAINEE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ALUMINIUM

Publication

EP 0996773 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928496 A

Priority

  • IB 9801045 W
  • US 89096397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902764A1] A drained cathode cell for the production of aluminium by the electrolysis of an aluminium compound dissolved in a molten electrolyte, in which a dimensionally stable active cathode surface (35) has a sloping aluminium-wettable surface (37) permitting the produced aluminium to drain from the cathode surface. The anodes (10) are carbon or non-carbon anodes with active faces (16) facing cathode surfaces (35) both at a slope up to about 60 DEG . The anode-cathode gap between the sloping anodes and cathodes is no more than 3 cm and is configured such that an upward circulation of the electrolyte is induced in the anode-cathode space by the anodically-released gases. An alumina-rich melt is fed at the lower part of the anode-cathode gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902764A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902764 A1 19990121; AU 8031398 A 19990208; CA 2295495 A1 19990121; CA 2295495 C 20071120; DE 69837966 D1 20070802; DE 69837966 T2 20080228; EP 0996773 A1 20000503; EP 0996773 B1 20070620; NO 20000095 A 20000306; NO 20000095 D0 20000107; NO 321787 B1 20060703

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070920

2008-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080325

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070920

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070620

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69837966 P 20070802

2007-07-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2007-06-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOLTECH INVENT S.A.

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL