Global Patent Index - EP 0996778 A1

EP 0996778 A1 2000-05-03 - CELLULOSE ACETATE WITH TRILOBAL CROSS SECTION

Title (en)

CELLULOSE ACETATE WITH TRILOBAL CROSS SECTION

Title (de)

CELLULOSEACETATFILAMENTE MIT TRILOBALEM QUERSCHNITT

Title (fr)

FILAMENTS D'ACETATE DE CELLULOSE A SECTION TRILOBEE

Publication

EP 0996778 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943731 A

Priority

  • DE 19730485 A
  • EP 9804409 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730485A1] The invention relates to cellulose acetate filaments with trilobal cross section and with a degree of substitution of approximately 2.1 to 3.0. They have a filament titer of less than 3.3 dtex, a PE form factor of less than 0.320, and a PH form factor of less than 0.560. These cellulose acetate filaments have particularly advantageous absorptive qualities when used in cigarette filters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 2/30; A24D 3/10; D01D 5/253

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/10 (2006.01); D01D 5/253 (2006.01); D01F 2/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/10 (2013.01); D01D 5/253 (2013.01); D01F 2/30 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2965 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2973 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904071A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730485 A1 19990121; DE 19730485 C2 20030703; AU 9154098 A 19990210; CA 2296690 A1 19990128; CA 2296690 C 20030204; EP 0996778 A1 20000503; EP 0996778 B1 20030917; JP 2001510245 A 20010731; JP 3299955 B2 20020708; US 6177194 B1 20010123; WO 9904071 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130715

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130715

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA ACETOW G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809658 P 20031023

2003-10-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020614

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB