Global patent index - EP 0996782 A1

EP 0996782 A1 2000-05-03 - CARRIER DEVICE FOR COMPONENTS OF A WEAVING MACHINE

Title (en)

CARRIER DEVICE FOR COMPONENTS OF A WEAVING MACHINE

Title (de)

TRAGVORRICHTUNG FÜR KOMPONENTEN EINER WEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT POUR ELEMENTS CONSTITUTIFS D'UN METIER A TISSER

Publication

EP 0996782 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930612 A

Priority

  • CH 9800302 W
  • CH 175397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904076A1] The invention relates to a carrier device for components of a weaving machine, said components substantially extending along the weaving width of the weaving machine. The inventive device can be removed from the weaving machine when the latter is stripped down or fitted. In order to create a carrier device, enabling said components (4, 5) of the weaving machine to be safely transported using various means and providing easy and quick removal from or insertion in said weaving machine, the carrier device has an almost horizontally arranged main support (1) for the components and a self-centering support element (17, 18) for the main support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904076A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904076 A1 19990128; AU 8099298 A 19990210; DE 59806125 D1 20021205; EP 0996782 A1 20000503; EP 0996782 B1 20021030

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070710

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2003-10-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031028

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-08-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806125

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-05

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2002-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011023

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000110

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI