Global Patent Index - EP 0996783 A1

EP 0996783 A1 2000-05-03 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ALIGNING THE EYELETS OF HARNESS ELEMENTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ALIGNING THE EYELETS OF HARNESS ELEMENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSRICHTEN VON AUGEN VON GESCHIRRELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ALIGNER DES OEILLETS D'ELEMENTS DE HARNAIS

Publication

EP 0996783 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930613 A

Priority

  • CH 9800303 W
  • CH 175497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904077A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for aligning the eyelets (4) of harness elements (1) in weaving machines, enabling the eyelet position in a harness element to be precisely determined and changed if required. A sensor (11; 30, 31; 40, 41) is provided which traverses the plane of the eyelets (4) and detects the position of the latter. Once the position has been detected, it can be changed by longitudinally displacing the harness element (1). According to a preferred second configuration for the implementation of the invention, an integral element (60) carries out both heald hook centering and thread eyelet detection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03J 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904077A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904077 A1 19990128; AU 8099398 A 19990210; CA 2296295 A1 19990128; CN 1086749 C 20020626; CN 1264437 A 20000823; CZ 20000141 A3 20000614; CZ 297037 B6 20060816; DE 59805828 D1 20021107; EP 0996783 A1 20000503; EP 0996783 B1 20021002; ID 24069 A 20000706; JP 2001510246 A 20010731; TR 200000163 T2 20010621; TW 436539 B 20010528; US 6282765 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STAUBLI A.G. PFAFFIKON

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090818

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1029816

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20021002

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805828

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-07

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011220

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000110

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT