Global Patent Index - EP 0996789 A1

EP 0996789 A1 2000-05-03 - RESILIENT RAILWAY RAIL FASTENING CLIPS AND ASSOCIATED RAIL FASTENING CLIP ANCHORING DEVICES

Title (en)

RESILIENT RAILWAY RAIL FASTENING CLIPS AND ASSOCIATED RAIL FASTENING CLIP ANCHORING DEVICES

Title (de)

ELASTISCHE EISENBAHNSCHIENENBEFESTIGUNGSKLAMMER UND DAZUGEHÖRENDE VERANKERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ATTACHES ELASTIQUES DE FIXATION DE RAILS DE VOIE FERREE ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIES D'ANCRAGE D'ATTACHES DE FIXATION DE RAIL

Publication

EP 0996789 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98932355 A

Priority

  • GB 9801956 W
  • GB 9714899 A
  • GB 9810241 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904094A1] A resilient railway rail fastening clip, for fastening a railway rail to an underlying foundation, of the type having an anchoring leg (21) whereby the clip is retained by a rail fastening clip anchoring device (400), has means for resisting unauthorised disengagement of the clip from such an anchoring device (400) comprising first locating means (21c), provided on the said anchoring leg (21) at a region spaced from a free end A thereof, for cooperating with second locating means (404) provided inside the housing (402) of such an anchoring device (400) when the anchoring leg (21) of the clip is inserted therein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/303 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904094A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904094 A1 19990128; AU 8229398 A 19990210; BR 9815505 A 20001107; CN 1158429 C 20040721; CN 1264448 A 20000823; EP 0996789 A1 20000503; EP 0996789 B1 20030604; GB 0109250 D0 20010530; GB 2358034 A 20010711; GB 2358034 B 20010926; TW 489844 U 20020601

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): FR

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01B 9/30 A

2002-12-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RESILIENT RAILWAY RAIL FASTENING CLIPS AND ASSOCIATED RAIL FASTENING CLIP ANCHORING DEVICES

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020709

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR