Global Patent Index - EP 0996796 A1

EP 0996796 A1 2000-05-03 - A ROOF ASSEMBLY AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH ROOF ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

A ROOF ASSEMBLY AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH ROOF ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

DACHAUFBAU UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES SOLCHEN DACHAUFBAUS

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE TOIT ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN TEL ENSEMBLE TOIT

Publication

EP 0996796 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933564 A

Priority

  • DK 9800309 W
  • DK 88097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904114A1] The invention relates to a roof constuction comprising a lower layer (1), a roofing layer (2) which is preferably laid onto the surpport and permanently connected thereto, a waterproof membrane (3, 4) comprising sheets of membrane material laid with overlay on the roofing layer; wherein the lower layer (3) of the overlay is, in the peripheral area of the sheet, in permanent connection with the support (1); and wherein the upper layer (4) of the overlay is in connection with the lower layer (3) of the overlay. In accordance with the invention, the roof construction is characterised in that the permanent connection between the lower membrane layer in the overlay and the support consists of a permanent mutual welded or adhesive connection (6) between support (2) and the lower membrane layer (3) in the overlay.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/149 (2013.01); E04D 5/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904114A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904114 A1 19990128; AU 8333498 A 19990210; DK 173299 B1 20000620; DK 88097 A 19990119; EP 0996796 A1 20000503; EP 0996796 B1 20031001; NO 20000214 A 20000317; NO 20000214 D0 20000117; NO 313760 B1 20021125

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150706

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150706

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150706

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140710

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FI GB

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FI GB