Global Patent Index - EP 0996797 A1

EP 0996797 A1 2000-05-03 - COMPONENT

Title (en)

COMPONENT

Title (de)

BAUTEIL

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION

Publication

EP 0996797 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943699 A

Priority

  • DE 9801974 W
  • DE 19730174 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730174A1] The invention relates to a component (1) comprising at least one partially two-dimensional reinforcement element (3), wherein the base body (2) of said component (1) substantially consists of a hydraulically set matrix. In order to improve the load bearing performance of said component (1), the reinforcing element (3) is arranged at least partially in a slot (4) in the surface (5) of the base body (2), fixed to said slot (4) by means of at least one longitudinal anchorage and thus joined to the base body (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/0218 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904116A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730174 A1 19990211; DE 19730174 C2 20011206; AT 205568 T 20010915; EP 0996797 A1 20000503; EP 0996797 B1 20010912; PL 198884 B1 20080731; PL 338141 A1 20000925; WO 9904116 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050715

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-03-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-07-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040715

2003-07-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BILFINGER + BERGER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-18

2001-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 205568

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BLASCHKO, MICHAEL

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI