Global Patent Index - EP 0996805 A1

EP 0996805 A1 2000-05-03 - RETRACTABLE EXTENSION FOR THE GUIDING RAIL OF A CLIMBING GUARD

Title (en)

RETRACTABLE EXTENSION FOR THE GUIDING RAIL OF A CLIMBING GUARD

Title (de)

VERSENKBARE VERLÄNGERUNG DER FÜHRUNGSSCHIENE EINER STEIGSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROLONGEMENT ESCAMOTABLE DU RAIL DE GUIDAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE MONTEE

Publication

EP 0996805 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941354 A

Priority

  • DE 29712753 U
  • EP 9804460 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904127A1] The invention relates to a device for protecting a person stepping onto or off a climbing path on a roof edge, a roof ascent, a pit mouth and similar. Said device comprises a guiding rail (10), for guiding a catching device to which a person using the climbing path can be secured, and an extension piece (24) of the guiding rail (10). The extension piece (24) of the guiding rail (10) can be moved between a first and second position. In the first position, the extension piece (24) is fitted in such a way that it does not jut out above the guiding rail (10). In the second position, it is longitudinally aligned with the guide rail. The extension piece (24) can be moved along the guiding rail (10), at a certain distance from said guiding rail. Once the extension piece has reached its final position, which corresponds to the second position, it can pivot 180 DEG , thus aligning with the extension (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 7/18; E06C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06C 1/38 (2006.01); E06C 7/18 (2006.01); E06C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 9/02 (2013.01); E06C 1/381 (2013.01); E06C 7/18 (2013.01); E06C 7/182 (2013.01); E06C 7/187 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904127A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29712753 U1 19970911; AT 239166 T 20030515; EP 0996805 A1 20000503; EP 0996805 B1 20030502; PL 337991 A1 20000925; US 6260662 B1 20010717; WO 9904127 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070717

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CHRISTIAN DALLOZ HOLDING DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. K

- Free text: CHRISTIAN DALLOZ HOLDING DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG#SELIGENWEG 10#95028 HOF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CHRISTIAN DALLOZ HOLDING DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG#SELIGENWEG 10#95028 HOF (DE)

2006-07-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060725

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CHRISTIAN DALLOZ HOLDING DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. & C

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-08-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808184 P 20030605

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-05-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-05-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RETRACTABLY EXTENDABLE GUIDE RAIL FOR SUPPORTING A SAFETY HARNESS

2002-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHRISTIAN DALLOZ HOLDING DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE