Global Patent Index - EP 0996845 A1

EP 0996845 A1 2000-05-03 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOVING AND/OR BREAKING OUT COATINGS OR AREAS OF UNDERSURFACES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOVING AND/OR BREAKING OUT COATINGS OR AREAS OF UNDERSURFACES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABTRAGEN UND/ODER HERAUSBRECHEN VON SCHICHTEN BZW. BEREICHEN AUS UNTERGRÜNDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ENLEVER ET/OU OTER EN LES BRISANT DES COUCHES OU DES ZONES SITUEES DANS DES SUBSTRATS

Publication

EP 0996845 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936107 A

Priority

DE 9801546 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963291A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for removing and breaking out coatings or areas of undersurfaces, for example surface- and edge-milling for reprocessing gutters, moulds, ladles, Bessemer converters and slag-collecting vessels, for cleaning electric furnaces and for removing contaminated waste and contaminated coatings in asbestos cleaning. Axially parallel drums (9) which rotate in opposite directions and are each driven directly by a hydraulic drive mechanism (21) are used. The chippers (13) of said drums (9), which rotate with them, engage one after the other on a helical line (E-E; F-F), slightly laterally offset. As the individual drums rotate in opposite directions they are both subjected to a controlled rotational movement in one direction, about a single, parallel axis (D-D) Said axis is parallel to the axes of rotation of the individual drums. The chippers (13) are distributed in such a way on the helixes, which extend in opposite directions, that no axial power components come into play upon engagement. The drive shaft (20) and the axis of rotation of the hydraulic axle are aligned. The additional unidirectional rotational movement is produced by a hydraulic pivot device which is integrated into the milling head. Said milling head has a rail with which it is fixed to the receptacle of a telescopic arm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 23/02; B22D 41/00; B22D 41/02; E21B 7/00; F27D 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/02 (2006.01); F27D 1/16 (2006.01); F27D 25/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 25/001 (2013.01); B22D 41/026 (2013.01); F27D 1/1694 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963291A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963291 A1 19991209; AT 215212 T 20020415; AU 8530098 A 19991220; DE 59803534 D1 20020502; EP 0996845 A1 20000503; EP 0996845 B1 20020327

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2004-06-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-10-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-09-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020610

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803534 20020502

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-03-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215212 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010809

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI GB IE IT LI NL SE