Global Patent Index - EP 0996848 A1

EP 0996848 A1 2000-05-03 - HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR

Publication

EP 0996848 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98921490 A

Priority

  • DE 19730389 A
  • EP 9802472 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730389A1] The invention relates to a heat exchanger comprising at least one first tube (4) for conducting a first fluid and at least one second tube (5) for conducting a heat dissipating fluid. At least the first tube (4) which is made of a fluid-tight corrosion and oxidation resistant substance is held in a supporting structure (3) comprising several individual elements containing SiC in a bore hole of said partial elements (1,2). The inventive heat exchanger is characterized in that the supporting structure (3) is composed of flat or disc shaped partial elements (1,2) which are made of a reinforced carbon and/or ceramic composite material, stacked on top of each other and joined to each other by a SiC coating, and that a ceramic and/or carbon extension compensating layer (8) is arranged at least between the first tube (4) and the supporting structure (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 21/04; F28F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/00 (2006.01); F28F 1/32 (2006.01); F28F 9/013 (2006.01); F28F 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/32 (2013.01); F28D 7/0008 (2013.01); F28F 9/0131 (2013.01); F28F 21/04 (2013.01); F28F 2275/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904213A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730389 A1 19990121; DE 19730389 C2 20020606; EP 0996848 A1 20000503; EP 0996848 B1 20010801; WO 9904213 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080425

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070609

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-07-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Free text: BO 01/52 PAGES: 283, IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-12-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801133 20010906

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB