Global Patent Index - EP 0996866 A1

EP 0996866 A1 2000-05-03 - THERMO-OPTICAL CASCADED SWITCH COMPRISING GATES

Title (en)

THERMO-OPTICAL CASCADED SWITCH COMPRISING GATES

Title (de)

THERMO-OPTISCHE VERMITTLUNGSSTELLE MIT KASKADIERTEN TORSCHALTERN

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR THERMO-OPTIQUE MONTE EN CASCADE COMPRENANT DES PORTES

Publication

EP 0996866 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939575 A

Priority

  • EP 98939575 A
  • EP 9804020 W
  • EP 97202243 A
  • US 88873197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903015A1] The invention pertains to a thermo-optical switch comprising a cascade of 1xM optical switches, gates for selectively blocking and unblocking the output paths of the cascaded switch, and means for driving the 1xM switches and the gates, which means are arranged to switch a data signal from an input path of the cascaded switch to one of the output paths, wherein the said means are also arranged to switch an unwanted signal, by means of a number of the remaining 1xM switches, to at least one of the remaining output paths. In the cascaded switch according to the invention, the generated heat is distributed evenly over the area of the switch and the overall amount of heat generated is reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/00; H04Q 3/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/00 (2006.01); H04Q 3/52 (2006.01); H04Q 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04Q 11/0005 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0049 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903015A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903015 A1 19990121; AU 8803898 A 19990208; CA 2292509 A1 19990121; EP 0996866 A1 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02F 1/00 A

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04Q 3/52 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04Q 11/00 B

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JDS UNIPHASE INC.

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JDS UNIPHASE PHOTONICS C.V.

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JDS FITEL PHOTONICS C.V.

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000204

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL