Global Patent Index - EP 0996935 A2

EP 0996935 A2 2000-05-03 - AUTOMATIC MACHINE FOR DISPENSING MONEY

Title (en)

AUTOMATIC MACHINE FOR DISPENSING MONEY

Title (de)

GELD-AUSGABEAUTOMAT

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE D'ARGENT

Publication

EP 0996935 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98931973 A

Priority

  • DE 9801123 W
  • DE 19717010 A
  • DE 19738521 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848384A2] The invention relates to an automatic machine (1) for dispensing objects (rolls of coins (3)), especially money, comprising at least one magazine (2) for stocking up the objects (3) and at least one dispensing device for dispensing the objects (3) from the at least one magazine (2). A receiving device (6) which is able to travel, preferably up and down, is provided inside the dispensing device (1), the at least one magazine (2) being positioned with its take-out end (13) close to the travel path of said receiving device. An object (3) can thus be dispensed from the magazine (2) into the receiving device (6) via the at least one dispensing device when the receiving device (6) is positioned in the area of the take-out end of the magazine (2). The receiving device (6) is provided with at least one take-out device (18) as a dispensing device. This take-out device (18) runs out to engage with the object to be removed (3), so that when the receiving device (6) passes by the at least one magazine (2), said take-out device (18) is able to take an object (3) from said magazine (2), preferably by lifting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/00 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 11/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/00 (2013.01); G07D 11/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848384A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848384 A2 19981029; WO 9848384 A3 19990128; AT 276559 T 20041015; AU 8206698 A 19981113; DE 29880038 U1 20000621; EP 0996935 A2 20000503; EP 0996935 B1 20040915; US 6340095 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-04-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811958 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI