Global Patent Index - EP 0996956 A1

EP 0996956 A1 2000-05-03 - OVERVOLTAGE PROTECTOR FOR HIGH OR MEDIUM VOLTAGE

Title (en)

OVERVOLTAGE PROTECTOR FOR HIGH OR MEDIUM VOLTAGE

Title (de)

ÜBERSPANNUNGSABLEITER FÜR HOCH- ODER MITTELSPANNUNG

Title (fr)

ECLATEUR DECHARGEUR POUR HAUTE ET MOYENNE TENSION

Publication

EP 0996956 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941275 A

Priority

  • DE 9801858 W
  • DE 19728961 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728961A1] The invention relates to an overvoltage protector for high or medium voltage, comprising a diverter block (4) positioned inside a shielded housing (3) sealed in a gas-tight manner. According to the invention, a sensor, especially a temperature sensor (19) in the form of a surface wave sensor, is placed inside the shielded housing (3). Said surface wave sensor (19) is positioned in a housing (18) embodied as an antenna.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 31/24 (2006.01); H01C 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901877A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728961 A1 19990204; AT 230894 T 20030115; AU 744855 B2 20020307; AU 8972698 A 19990125; BR 9810367 A 20000829; CN 1129145 C 20031126; CN 1261980 A 20000802; EP 0996956 A1 20000503; EP 0996956 B1 20030108; JP 2000511362 A 20000829; JP 3485578 B2 20040113; RU 2195731 C2 20021227; US 6433989 B1 20020813; WO 9901877 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806875

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-03-06 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100820

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100617

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100608

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100702

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-04-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806875 P 20030213

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230894 T 20030115

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE