Global Patent Index - EP 0996959 A1

EP 0996959 A1 2000-05-03 - CIRCUIT BREAKER FOR LOW VOLTAGE ALTERNATING ELECTRIC INSTALLATION

Title (en)

CIRCUIT BREAKER FOR LOW VOLTAGE ALTERNATING ELECTRIC INSTALLATION

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER LEISTUNGSSCHALTER FÜR ELEKTRISCHE ANLAGEN MIT NIEDERWECHSELSPANNUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE COUPURE ELECTRIQUE POUR INSTALLATION ELECTRIQUE A BASSE TENSION ALTERNATIVE

Publication

EP 0996959 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99919323 A

Priority

  • FR 9901134 W
  • FR 9806272 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778789A1] The movement of the cam and contacts is such as to encourage contact self-cleaning. The switch or circuit breaker has two moving contacts (35,36) comprising two contact surfaces (38) arranged in perpendicular planes, corresponding with those of the fixed contacts (31,31' and 33,33'). Each moving contact (35,36) is arranged to move in a direction of radial translation relative to the control shaft (23) along a direction (F) which is perpendicular to a straight line passing through its two contact surfaces (38). The cam (50) comprises a flow track (56) and a return track (57) corresponding to the engaging and releasing of the contacts. These surfaces guide a driving pin (45) which is integral with a moving element (40) coupled to the moving contacts. The moving element is arranged to be translated radially w.r.t. the control shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 21/84; H01H 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/18 (2006.01); H01H 19/635 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/635 (2013.01); H01H 1/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959177A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778789 A1 19991119; FR 2778789 B1 20000630; CN 1118838 C 20030820; CN 1269052 A 20001004; DE 69920370 D1 20041028; EP 0996959 A1 20000503; EP 0996959 B1 20040922; US 6278619 B1 20010821; WO 9959177 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160414

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-01-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041230

2005-01-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050102

2004-12-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920370 P 20041028

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT