Global Patent Index - EP 0997084 A2

EP 0997084 A2 2000-05-03 - Custody bag for personal objects, with space for interchangeable graphic publicity, for use basically in supermarkets, self-service shops, and similar

Title (en)

Custody bag for personal objects, with space for interchangeable graphic publicity, for use basically in supermarkets, self-service shops, and similar

Title (de)

Tasche zur sicheren Verwahrung persönlicher Gegenstände mit austauschbarer Werbetafel, zum Gebrauch in Supermärkten, Selbstbedienungsläden und ähnlichem

Title (fr)

Sac pour la mise en sécurité d'objets d'usage personnel à carte d'affichage remplaçable utilisé dans des hypermarchés, supermarchés et similaires

Publication

EP 0997084 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99203464 A

Priority

AR 9805361 U

Abstract (en)

The bag this Patent refers to, consists of a totally transparent external film and contains sections with overlaid internal opaque laminar sections, forming internal pockets used to carry graphic publicity panels. Both the internal pockets and the opening of the bag are equipped with zips the cursor of which includes a theft-proof lock. At least one section of the side wall of the bag is totally transparent thus providing a view of the objects it contains, even when the bag is closed. The design foresees the inclusion of a smaller pocket on the outside. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 3/06; G09F 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 3/04 (2006.01); A45C 13/08 (2006.01); G09F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 23/06 (2013.01); A45C 3/04 (2013.01); A45C 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997084 A2 20000503; EP 0997084 A3 20021218; BR 7902735 U 20000912; ES 1041567 U 19990701; ES 1041567 Y 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030617

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI