Global Patent Index - EP 0997087 A1

EP 0997087 A1 2000-05-03 - Modular extruded countertops

Title (en)

Modular extruded countertops

Title (de)

Modulare extrudierte Arbeitsplatte

Title (fr)

Surface de travail modulaire extrudée

Publication

EP 0997087 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120846 A

Priority

  • US 17944898 A
  • US 24809599 A

Abstract (en)

A modular countertop is disclosed. The modular countertop permits individuals to mix countertop components and achieve a desired aesthetic effect. The modular countertop includes at least a first longitudinal extending countertop component and a second longitudinally extending countertop component. The first countertop component includes a first connecting member and the second countertop component includes a second connecting member, wherein the first connecting member and the second meting member selectively and securely couple the first and second countertop components together when the first and second connecting members are properly joined. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 77/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 13/08 (2006.01); A47B 77/02 (2006.01); A47B 96/18 (2006.01); A47K 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/022 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • US 17944898 A 19981027
  • US 97802697 A 19971125

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997087 A1 20000503; AR 019795 A1 20020320; AU 4885099 A 20000504; BR 9916723 A 20011211; CA 2281167 A1 20000427; CN 1252479 A 20000510; HU 9903516 A2 20010228; HU 9903516 A3 20010328; HU 9903516 D0 19991228; ID 25964 A 20001116; IL 131555 D0 20010128; JP 2000126047 A 20000509; KR 20000029296 A 20000525; MX PA99009888 A 20040901; PL 336255 A1 20000508

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1026827

2001-06-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001212

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI