Global Patent Index - EP 0997089 A1

EP 0997089 A1 2000-05-03 - A security device for an adjusting rack, particularly for a reclining chair

Title (en)

A security device for an adjusting rack, particularly for a reclining chair

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung für eine Verstellzahnstange, insbesondere für einen Liegestuhl

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour crémaillère susceptible de retenir une traverse, notamment de chaise longue

Publication

EP 0997089 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402607 A

Priority

FR 9813368 A

Abstract (en)

Safety element comprises a plastic hook (20) with an opening (22) and a counter weight, attached to the inside of the deck chair's notched bar (6) by a pivot (30) so that the opening of the hook aligns with a notch (18). When the transverse rod (17) of the chair back support (15) is dropped into the notch it presses against an inner surface (23) of the hook which causes it to pivot and close over the rod.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de sécurité pour une crémaillère (9, 10) formée de crans (19, 18) susceptibles de retenir une traverse (17), lesdits crans comportant une rampe (18a) et une butée (18b), et notamment une crémaillère de chaise longue. Selon l'invention, ce dispositif est constitué par une pièce (20) montée librement pivotante sur le côté d'au moins un cran (18, 19) et comportant une échancrure (21) définie d'un côté, par une partie en forme de crochet (22) et de l'autre côté, par une partie en forme de rampe (23) en direction de laquelle est recourbé le crochet et en ce que l'axe de pivotement (30) de ladite pièce est situé à un endroit tel qu'en position de repos, la partie en forme de rampe (23) est, sous l'effet de la gravité, en saillie par rapport à la rampe (18a) dudit cran tandis que la partie en forme de crochet (22) permet l'insertion de ladite traverse (17) et tel que, lors de son insertion dans ledit cran de la crémaillère, la traverse prend appui sur la partie en rampe (23) de la pièce et provoque le basculement du crochet (22) qui vient se refermer sur la traverse. L'invention s'applique à des chaises longues. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 4/40; A47C 1/026

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/026 (2006.01); A47C 4/40 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/40 (2013.01); A47C 1/026 (2013.01); A47C 20/043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 429966 A 19350611 - GODFREY SAMUEL MORETON

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997089 A1 20000503; DE 997089 T1 20010419; ES 2152199 T1 20010201; FR 2784877 A1 20000428; FR 2784877 B1 20010105

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020628

2001-04-19 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2001-02-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152199

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI