Global Patent Index - EP 0997098 A3

EP 0997098 A3 2001-12-12 - Floor cleaning device

Title (en)

Floor cleaning device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bodenreinigung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyer des sols

Publication

EP 0997098 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99113382 A

Priority

DE 19849595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0997098A2] The electric vacuum cleaner has a dust collection space (2) within the vacuum cleaner housing (1) provided with a removable cover (3) and a retention device (12) with a pair of opposing arms (13) for securing the stiffening plate of a filter bag. The retention device is displaced against a spring bias from a position in which it cooperates with a structure on the inside of the removable cover to block the fitting of the latter into a position in which the cover can be fitted, by the insertion of the filter bag.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/14; A47L 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/00 (2006.01); A47L 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/1472 (2013.01); A47L 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997098 A2 20000503; EP 0997098 A3 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI