Global patent index - EP 0997100 A1

EP 0997100 A1 2000-05-03 - Dishwasher rack

Title (en)

Dishwasher rack

Title (de)

Geschirrkorb für eine Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Panier de lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 0997100 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118238 A

Priority

DE 19847151 A

Abstract (en)

The basket (1) has a base for supporting objects to be cleaned and coupling for pipeline (5) through which washing liquid can be delivered to a defined area of the basket. Pipeline can be supplied with washing liquid by coupling first end of the line to a washing liquid supply point on one wall of a washing container of the dishwasher.

Abstract (de)

An einem Geschirrkorb (1) für eine Geschirrspülmäschine mit einem Boden zum Abstellen von Spülgutteilen (14) ist wenigstens eine Rohrleitung (5) angekoppelt, durch die Spülflüssigkeit einer vorbestimmten Zone des Geschirrkorbes (1) zuführbar ist. Ein über einer Austrittsstelle (10,13) der Rohrleitung (5) angeordnetes Spülgutteil wird von der austretenden Spülflüssigkeit besonders gut gereinigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50; A47L 15/16; A47L 15/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/16 (2006.01); A47L 15/39 (2006.01); A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/39 (2013.01); A47L 15/16 (2013.01); A47L 15/508 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19847151 A1 20000420; DE 19847151 C2 20030206; EP 0997100 A1 20000503; EP 0997100 B1 20040512

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909459

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030410

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI