Global Patent Index - EP 0997114 A1

EP 0997114 A1 2000-05-03 - Apparatus and method of manufacturing a straw filled with animal semen in a resilient plastic sheath

Title (en)

Apparatus and method of manufacturing a straw filled with animal semen in a resilient plastic sheath

Title (de)

Gerät und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mit tierischem Samen gefüllten Röhrchens in einer Umhüllung aus einem biegsamen Kunststoff

Title (fr)

Machine et procédé de fabrication d'une paillette remplie de semence animale contenue dans une gaine en matière plastique souple

Publication

EP 0997114 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402677 A

Priority

FR 9813520 A

Abstract (en)

The machine (5) consists of a feeder (6) for plastic sleeves (3), a feeder (7) for the straws (1) filled with semen, a rotary positioning system (8), and a pusher (11) with a drive (15) to insert the straws into the sleeves. The resulting assemblies drop into a container (16) in the form of a receiving hopper. The straw and sleeve feeders can be hoppers, loaders or cassettes, and the positioner can be a barrel or toothed belt.

Abstract (fr)

Machine (5) pour la fabrication d'un ensemble (13) constitué d'une paillette en matière plastique semi-rigide remplie de semence animale (1) dans une gaine en matière plastique souple (3) équipée d'un manchon de guidage (4), caractérisée en ce qu'elle comprend : un système d'alimentation de gaines (6), un système d'alimentation de paillettes (7), un système de positionnement en rotation (8) comprenant deux gorges, une gorge de positionnement de gaine, dite gorge avant (9), et une gorge de positionnement de paillette, dite gorge arrière (10), décalées radialement l'une par rapport à l'autre, un système poussoir (11) coopérant avec ledit système de positionnement en rotation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61D 19/00; A61D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61D 19/024 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 995878 A 19511210

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997114 A1 20000503; EP 0997114 B1 20040204; FR 2785173 A1 20000505; FR 2785173 B1 20010126

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-05-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040515

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2004-02-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR IT

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI