Global Patent Index - EP 0997131 A2

EP 0997131 A2 2000-05-03 - Method and device for the guidance of visualy impaired or blind persons

Title (en)

Method and device for the guidance of visualy impaired or blind persons

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Führung von Sehbehinderten und Blinden

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour le guidage des malvoyants ou aveugles

Publication

EP 0997131 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119418 A

Priority

DE 19850056 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using a GSM-UMTS receiver (10) worn on the body for radio waves contg. stored routes and in communication with the person via a speech output. The receiver has a sensor (13) that operates with a fan-shaped directional characteristic that is dynamically-periodically controlled in the direction of motion of the wearer. Signals received from the surroundings by the sensor are converted in the receiver, which is connected to base stations and activates a location algorithm and announces dynamic locality information using speech. The user can perform functions including switching on and off, tuning, etc. via a speech input. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Es wird hier ein auf der Grundlage der GSM-/UMTS-Anwendung basierendes Blindenführungssystem aus einem Verfahren und einer Einrichtung beschrieben. Dieses Blindenführungssystem arbeitet so, daß die Grob-Lokalisierung/-Positionierung der blinden bzw. schwer sehbehinderten Person (1) über das terrestrische GSM-/UMTS-Mobilfunksystem erfolgt und daß die Fein-Lokalisierung mit Hilfe eines "aktuelle Orts-Information" liefernden Sensors (13) erfolgt. Die Grob-Positionierungsinformation wird zusammen mit der Leitinformation über einen systemimanenten Lokalitätsserver in computergenerierte Sprachinformation umgesetzt. Gleiches gilt für die ständig anfallende aktuelle Ortsinformation durch das Erkennungs- bzw. Meßsystem, das ein Radar- oder Infrarot- oder Ultraschallsensor sein kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 3/06; G01S 5/00; G01S 13/86; G01S 17/46; G01S 17/87; G09B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/068 (2013.01); A61H 3/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997131 A2 20000503; EP 0997131 A3 20040102; EP 0997131 B1 20060104; AT 314837 T 20060215; DE 19850056 A1 20000504; DE 59913012 D1 20060330

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091005

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913012

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE TELEKOM A.G.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-06-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060605

2006-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-04-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060415

2006-04-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-04-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913012 P 20060330

2006-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-02-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-01-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040809

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61H 3/06 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09B 21/00 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01S 17/87 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01S 13/86 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01S 17/46 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01S 5/00 B

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI