Global patent index - EP 0997165 A2

EP 0997165 A2 2000-05-03 - Blocking device for ventilation device

Title (en)

Blocking device for ventilation device

Title (de)

Absperrvorrichtung für eine Belüftungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de blocage pour dispositif de ventilation

Publication

EP 0997165 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121508 A

Priority

DE 19850113 A

Abstract (en)

The shut-off device (1) has at least one gas-flow opening (3,4) which is completely closed when the closure flap (10) is closed by means of a control (22). The closure flap is held open by a holder (25). The closure flap is released when a pre-set closure temperature is exceeded. The at least one transition part (17) has a seal which has fabric (50) which liquefies or evaporates when a preset melting temperature is exceeded.

Abstract (de)

Eine Absperrvorrichtung für eine Belüftungsöffnung hat einen Gasdurchtrittsbereich mit Gasdurchtrittsöffnungen (3, 4), mit beweglich angelenkten Verschlußklappen (9, 10), sowie mit einer Halteeinrichtung (25). Die Verschlußklappen (9, 10) und die Halteeinrichtung (25) legen einen Totbereich fest, der zumindest in der Offenstellung der Verschlußklappen (9, 10) vom Gasdurchtrittsbereich durch wenigstens einen Übergangsbereich (17) getrennt ist. Im Übergangsbereich (17) ist ein Stoff (50) vorgesehen, der bei einem Überschreiten einer vorbestimmten Schmelztemperatur niedrig-viskose Eigenschaften annimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 2/14; A62C 2/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/14 (2006.01); A62C 2/24 (2006.01); F24F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/1486 (2013.01); A62C 2/14 (2013.01); A62C 2/242 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0098 (2013.01); F24F 2013/146 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19634305 A1 19970626 - SCHULTE GUENTER [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997165 A2 20000503; EP 0997165 A3 20011004; DE 19850113 C1 20000615

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-08-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI