Global Patent Index - EP 0997167 A1

EP 0997167 A1 2000-05-03 - Sports device with relatively rotating frames

Title (en)

Sports device with relatively rotating frames

Title (de)

Sportgerät mit zueinander drehbaren Rahmen

Title (fr)

Appareil de sport à cadres relativement rotatifs

Publication

EP 0997167 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99203581 A

Priority

CH 218498 A

Abstract (en)

The sports equipment (1) has a first, large frame (3) which rotates about a central axis (8) in a carrier support (2) rotating housing (7), and has two smaller closed frames (4) which move around a second central axis (10) relative to the first frame (3). The two frames are elliptical and the first frame is adjustable to a fixed position by means of an arresting device (11), and has brakes.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein neues Sportgerät (1) beschrieben mit einem ersten grösseren geschlossenen Rahmen (3), der um eine erste zentrale Achse (8) drehbar in auf Trägerstützen (2) angeordneten Drehlagern (7) gelagert ist, und mit einem zweiten kleineren geschlossenen Rahmen (4), der bezüglich des ersten Rahmens (3) um eine zweite zentrale Achse (10) in Drehlagern (9) gelagert ist Die zweite Achse (10) ist senkrecht zur ersten Achse (8) ausgerichtet. Am zweiten Rahmen (4) ist ferner ein Fusssockel (5) befestigt. Es sind ausschliesslich zwei zueinander drehbaren Rahmen (3, 4) vorgesehen, von welchen mindestens der zweite Rahmen (4) sich im wesentlichen in Längsrichtung erstreckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 19/04 (2006.01); A63B 21/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 19/04 (2013.01); A63B 21/0051 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5342244 A 19940830 - NELSON KEVIN R [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997167 A1 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030128

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI