Global Patent Index - EP 0997196 A2

EP 0997196 A2 2000-05-03 - Method of and apparatus for grinding material

Title (en)

Method of and apparatus for grinding material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Zerkleinerung von Material

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de broyage de matériau

Publication

EP 0997196 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307872 A

Priority

GB 9821638 A

Abstract (en)

A method of and an apparatus for grinding material is described, a vessel (1) for containing a grinding medium such as a ball charge (4). A means (13) for imparting a vibration force upon the vessel (1) is also provided. The vessel (1) has an inlet (5;6;18) to permit the material to be ground to be input into the vessel (1), and an outlet (5;6;18) to permit the ground material to exit the vessel (1). The inlet (5;6;18) and the outlet (5;16;18) are vertically spaced apart. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997196 A2 20000503; EP 0997196 A3 20001220; GB 9821638 D0 19981125

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI