Global patent index - EP 0997212 A1

EP 0997212 A1 2000-05-03 - Device for holding cams during the process of securing them on a tube by expansion of the tube

Title (en)

Device for holding cams during the process of securing them on a tube by expansion of the tube

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Halten von Nocken während deren Befestigung auf ein Rohr durch Aufweiten des Rohres

Title (fr)

Dispositif de maintien de cames au cours de leur frettage sur un tube par expansion du tube

Publication

EP 0997212 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410146 A

Priority

FR 9813543 A

Abstract (en)

The cam holder consists of two wedges (16', 17') for each cam (10), made with recesses matching the cam contours. The dimensions of the recesses are selected so that the clearance between their surfaces and the largest cam over a give tolerance range is as close as possible to zero. The two wedges are designed so they fit together regardless of the cam dimensions in the tolerance range, with the pairs of wedges assembled side by side along the tube and held together by independent power cylinders.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de maintien de cames frittées au cours de leur frettage sur un tube par expansion du tube, comprenant, pour chaque came (10), deux cales (16', 17') destinées à emprisonner la came entre elles dans des logements complémentaires au contour de la came. Les dimensions des logements sont choisies de manière que le jeu entre les logements et la plus grande came dans une plage de tolérance prédéterminée soit aussi près que possible de zéro par excès, les deux cales étant prévues pour être plaquées l'une contre l'autre quelles que soient les dimensions de la came dans la plage de tolérance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/84; B21D 39/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/845 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49293 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4994 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53961 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53996 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4882825 A 19891128 - NAKAMURA MASANOBU [JP]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 310 (M - 630) 9 October 1987 (1987-10-09)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997212 A1 20000503; EP 0997212 B1 20030129; DE 69905117 D1 20030306; DE 69905117 T2 20030911; ES 2191405 T3 20030901; FR 2784925 A1 20000428; FR 2784925 B1 20010119; US 2001025416 A1 20011004; US 6367140 B2 20020409

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111026

2013-10-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131029

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111025

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111025

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69905117

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111025

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101105

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-08-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090716 AND 20090722

2006-05-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2005-12-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-12-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-12-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2191405

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69905117

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020409

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI