Global Patent Index - EP 0997214 A1

EP 0997214 A1 2000-05-03 - Process for obtaining non-ferrous metal castings by greensand mould casting

Title (en)

Process for obtaining non-ferrous metal castings by greensand mould casting

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Nichteisen-Metallgussteilen in Nassguss-Sandformen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour obtenir de pièces moulées en alliages non-ferreux au moyen de moules en sable vert

Publication

EP 0997214 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500010 A

Priority

ES 9802242 A

Abstract (en)

The process lies in drying the cavity (3) of the greensand moulds (1) in which molten metal is cast for obtaining respective castings, wherein drying of said cavity (3) is made before the mould filling step in order to eliminate humidity and prevent porosities from being formed on the finished casting. In order for the cavity in the moulds (1) to be dried, the moulds are provided with recesses (2) in order that hot air may be applied through the top hood (4) of a drying station and negative pressure or vacuum may be applied through a bottom sink (6), which results in a hot air stream flowing between the cavities (3) in the moulds (1), directed towards the mould recesses (2), extracting the humidity from such moulds (1) and redirecting the extracted water towards the bottom sink (6). In a different embodiment, the moulds (1') have through recesses (2'), which recesses are provided in the sector of the facility in which the moulds (1') proper are conveyed from the moulding chamber to the filling station, the through recesses (2') being provided by means of the piercing ends or points (21) of respective rods (20) that may be moved up and down. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 47/02; B22D 18/04; B22D 27/15; B22C 11/10; B22C 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/12 (2006.01); B22C 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 18/04 (2006.01); B22D 27/15 (2006.01); B22D 33/00 (2006.01); B22D 47/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 47/02 (2013.01); B22C 9/12 (2013.01); B22C 11/10 (2013.01); B22D 18/04 (2013.01); B22D 27/15 (2013.01); B22D 33/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9311892 A2 19930624 - BAXI PARTNERSHIP LTD [GB]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 256 (M - 1413) 20 May 1993 (1993-05-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 063 (M - 365) 20 March 1985 (1985-03-20)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997214 A1 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2000-11-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20000922

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI