Global patent index - EP 0997232 A3

EP 0997232 A3 2000-11-22 - Clamping tool, especially a clamping clip, clamping rod or clamping bench

Title (en)

Clamping tool, especially a clamping clip, clamping rod or clamping bench

Title (de)

Spannwerkzeug, insbesondere Spannzwinge, Spannstock oder Spanntisch

Title (fr)

Outil de serrage, en particulier serre-joint, bloc de serrage ou table de serrage

Publication

EP 0997232 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125704 A

Priority

  • DE 19731579 A
  • EP 98940087 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19731579A1] The invention relates to a clamping tool, especially a clamping clip with a clamping area between a first mobile clamping jaw (1) which rests at the end of a pull or slide rod and a fixed second clamping jaw (2) which rests on a housing. The inventive clamping tool also comprises a pivoting handle (10). Said handle (10) is located opposite the fixed clamping jaw (2) in relation to the longitudinal extension of the pull rod and next to a grip situated on the housing side. As the handle (10) is displaced against the grip, the pull rod is displaced progressively in such a way that the first mobile clamping jaw is moved towards the second fixed clamping jaw, any back pressure being locked. The clamping tool also has a release lever for releasing the back pressure lock. This release lever rests on the housing. In order to increase the scope of application of the inventive clamping clip, both the handle (10) and the release lever (15) are located on the side of the grip (33) facing away from the clamping area (1, 2), the lever transmission ratios are adjusted as the clamping force increases for smaller displacement paths and the mobile clamping jaw can be moved back progressively by operating the release lever (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19731579 A1 19990128; AU 8853298 A 19990216; CA 2304718 A1 19990204; CA 2304718 C 20090331; CN 100450719 C 20090114; CN 100528490 C 20090819; CN 1136078 C 20040128; CN 1265056 A 20000830; CN 1389328 A 20030108; CN 1899768 A 20070124; DE 19880089 B4 20070419; DE 19880089 D2 19991111; EP 0997232 A2 20000503; EP 0997232 A3 20001122; EP 0997232 B1 20021023; EP 0997233 A2 20000503; EP 0997233 A3 20001122; EP 0997233 B1 20030108; EP 0998373 A1 20000510; EP 0998373 B1 20001227; US 6578837 B1 20030617; WO 9904932 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806061

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-28

2002-10-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 998373

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB