Global Patent Index - EP 0997233 A2

EP 0997233 A2 2000-05-03 - Clamping tool, especially a clamping clip, clamping rod or clamping bench

Title (en)

Clamping tool, especially a clamping clip, clamping rod or clamping bench

Title (de)

Spannwerkzeug, insbesondere Spannzwinge, Spannstock oder Spanntisch

Title (fr)

Outil de serrage, en particulier serre-joint, bloc de serrage ou table de serrage

Publication

EP 0997233 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125705 A

Priority

  • DE 19731579 A
  • EP 98940087 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19731579A1] The invention relates to a clamping tool, especially a clamping clip with a clamping area between a first mobile clamping jaw (1) which rests at the end of a pull or slide rod and a fixed second clamping jaw (2) which rests on a housing. The inventive clamping tool also comprises a pivoting handle (10). Said handle (10) is located opposite the fixed clamping jaw (2) in relation to the longitudinal extension of the pull rod and next to a grip situated on the housing side. As the handle (10) is displaced against the grip, the pull rod is displaced progressively in such a way that the first mobile clamping jaw is moved towards the second fixed clamping jaw, any back pressure being locked. The clamping tool also has a release lever for releasing the back pressure lock. This release lever rests on the housing. In order to increase the scope of application of the inventive clamping clip, both the handle (10) and the release lever (15) are located on the side of the grip (33) facing away from the clamping area (1, 2), the lever transmission ratios are adjusted as the clamping force increases for smaller displacement paths and the mobile clamping jaw can be moved back progressively by operating the release lever (15).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Spannwerkzeug, insbesondere Spannzwinge, Spannstock oder Spanntisch mit einer ersten (1) und einer zweiten Spannbacke (2), wobei die erste, an einer Zug- oder Schubstange (3) sitzende Spannbacke (1) gegenüber der zweiten Spannbacke (2) mittels einer ersten auf einen gegen die Rückstellkraft einer Feder (4) verlagerbaren Mitnahmeschieber wirkenden Hebelübertragung schrittweise in eine Richtung verlagerbar ist, und mit einer freigebbaren Rückdrücksperre, und schlägt zur Erzielung einer gebrauchsvorteilhaften Weiterbildung vor, daß sich die Hebelverhältnisse der Hebelübertragung bei zunehmender Spannkraft sich hin zu kleineren Verlagerungswegen ändern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19731579 A1 19990128; AU 8853298 A 19990216; CA 2304718 A1 19990204; CA 2304718 C 20090331; CN 100450719 C 20090114; CN 100528490 C 20090819; CN 1136078 C 20040128; CN 1265056 A 20000830; CN 1389328 A 20030108; CN 1899768 A 20070124; DE 19880089 B4 20070419; DE 19880089 D2 19991111; EP 0997232 A2 20000503; EP 0997232 A3 20001122; EP 0997232 B1 20021023; EP 0997233 A2 20000503; EP 0997233 A3 20001122; EP 0997233 B1 20030108; EP 0998373 A1 20000510; EP 0998373 B1 20001227; US 6578837 B1 20030617; WO 9904932 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-13 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060926

2006-12-13 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060926

2006-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060609

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060605

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: IRWIN INDUSTRIAL TOOLS GMBH

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806876 P 20030213

2003-01-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 998373

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLANK, STEFAN

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEGEN, KLEMENS

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NONIEWICZ, ZBIGNIEW

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUELLER, HANS-JUERGEN

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB