Global Patent Index - EP 0997261 B9

EP 0997261 B9 2001-04-11 - Laser welding method and apparatus for joining a plurality of plastic articles with each other or with other materials

Title (en)

Laser welding method and apparatus for joining a plurality of plastic articles with each other or with other materials

Title (de)

Laserfügeverfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von verschiedenen Werkstücken aus Kunststoff oder Kunststoff mit anderen Materialien

Title (fr)

Procédure et appareil de soudage avec laser pour relier divers articles en matière plastique entre eux ou avec d'autres matériaux

Publication

EP 0997261 B9 (DE)

Application

EP 99101816 A

Priority

EP 99101816 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0997261A1] Laser bonding of plastic workpieces (4, 5) to one another or to other materials, using a structured laser opaque mask (3) between a moving linear laser beam source (1) and the workpieces (4, 5), is new. Plastic workpieces (4, 5) are laser bonded to one another or to other materials by (a) positioning a laser opaque workpiece (5) below a laser transparent workpiece (4) facing the laser source (1); (b) positioning a laser opaque mask (3), having structures (9) larger than the laser beam wavelength, between the laser source (1) and the workpieces (4, 5) for bonding the workpieces in a certain joint region (6) of the workpiece contact faces (7); (c) directing the laser source (1) at the contact faces (7) to form a line (8); and (d) moving the laser beam (2) and the mask (3) relative to the workpieces or the laser beam (2) relative to the mask (3) and the workpieces (4, 5). An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for carrying out the above process, comprising a laser source (1) and a mask (3) of laser opaque material between the workpieces (4, 5) and a mechanism (21, 22) for continuous relative motion between the laser beam (2) and the workpieces (4, 5). Preferred Features: The laser beam (2) is directed perpendicularly onto the joint region (6) and pressure is applied to the workpieces (4, 5) during bonding. One of the workpieces may have a projection adjacent the joint region so that, during compression of the workpieces, a cavity is created between the contact faces. The laser source (1) and the workpieces (4, 5) are moved relative to one another at a high speed dependent on the maximum laser power necessary for achieving the requisite melting temperature, the relative motion optionally being produced by swiveling or rotating a mirror about an axis parallel to the contact faces (7). The laser beam (2) is produced by a semiconductor laser and produces a focal line of constant width and of length determined by the distance of the laser source from the contact faces (7) and corresponding matching of the laser power to the requisite melting temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 65/16; B29C 65/14; B23K 26/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/06 (2006.01); B29C 65/16 (2006.01); B29C 65/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 66/836 (2013.01); B23K 26/066 (2015.10); B29C 65/1635 (2013.01); B29C 65/1654 (2013.01); B29C 65/1664 (2013.01); B29C 65/1674 (2013.01); B29C 65/1696 (2013.01); B29C 66/1122 (2013.01); B29C 66/30223 (2013.01); B29C 66/322 (2013.01); B29C 66/3242 (2013.01); B29C 66/53461 (2013.01); B29C 66/54 (2013.01); B29C 66/7392 (2013.01); B29C 66/73921 (2013.01); B29C 66/74 (2013.01); B29C 66/81266 (2013.01); B29C 66/81267 (2013.01); B29C 66/91216 (2013.01); B29C 66/91221 (2013.01); B29C 66/9161 (2013.01); B29C 65/1616 (2013.01); B29C 65/1619 (2013.01); B29C 66/71 (2013.01); B29C 66/8122 (2013.01); B29C 66/961 (2013.01); B29K 2995/0025 (2013.01); B29K 2995/0027 (2013.01); B29L 2031/756 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B29C 66/71 + B29K 2069/00
  2. B29C 66/8122 + B29K 2905/00
  3. B29C 66/8122 + B29K 2909/08
  4. B29C 66/8122 + B29K 2901/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997261 A1 20000503; EP 0997261 B1 20000510; EP 0997261 B9 20010411; AT 192692 T 20000515; CN 1121936 C 20030924; CN 1266776 A 20000920; DE 59900005 D1 20000615; ES 2149637 T3 20001101; JP 2000218698 A 20000808; JP 3303259 B2 20020715; KR 100348169 B1 20020809; KR 20000052487 A 20000825; SG 82056 A1 20010724; TW 426572 B 20010321; US 6465757 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900005

- Representative's name: ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-10-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG, CH

- Document: AT 192692 T

- Effective date: 20120913

2012-08-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120726 AND 20120801

2012-05-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Effective date: 20120504

2012-05-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-05-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG, CH

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES, KAEGISWIL, CH

- Document: DE 59900005

- Effective date: 20120130

2012-03-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900005

- Representative's name: ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120130

2012-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Free text: LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES#GALILEOSTRASSE 10#6056 KAEGISWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- LEISTER TECHNOLOGIES AG#GALILEO-STRASSE 10#6056 KAEGISWIL (CH)

2012-03-14 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120307

2012-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900005

- Representative's name: ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE, KLOCKE, SPAETH, BARTH, DE

2008-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES

- Free text: LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES#RIEDSTRASSE#6060 SARNEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- LEISTER PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES#GALILEOSTRASSE 10#6056 KAEGISWIL (CH)

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE KLOCKE SPAETH BARTH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2001-05-23 [GBCC] GB: CORRECTED TRANSLATION (OF CLAIMS) FILED (GB SECTION 80(3)/1977)

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149637 T3

2000-09-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900005 20000615

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192692 T 20000515

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990225

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI