Global Patent Index - EP 0997272 A1

EP 0997272 A1 2000-05-03 - A heat mode sensitive imaging element for making positive working printing plates

Title (en)

A heat mode sensitive imaging element for making positive working printing plates

Title (de)

Im Wärmeverfahren arbeitendes Aufzeichnungsmaterial zur Herstellung von positiv arbeitenden Druckplatten

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement thermosensible et procédé pour la production de plaques lithographiques positives

Publication

EP 0997272 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203609 A

Priority

EP 98203609 A

Abstract (en)

According to the present invention there is provided a heat mode imaging element for making a lithographic printing plate comprising on a lithographic base with a hydrophilic surface a first layer including a polymer, soluble in an aqueous alkaline solution and a top layer on the same side of the lithographic base as the first layer which top layer is IR-sensitive and unpenetrable for an alkaline developer wherein said first layer and said top layer may be one and the same layer; characterized in that said top layer contains at least one blockcopolymer in an amount between 0.5 and 500 mg/m<2>.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/032 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1016 (2013.01); B41C 2210/02 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/06 (2013.01); B41C 2210/14 (2013.01); B41C 2210/22 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41C 2210/262 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0864420 A1 19980916 - AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997272 A1 20000503; EP 0997272 B1 20030723; DE 69816618 D1 20030828; DE 69816618 T2 20040609; JP 2000137321 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AGFA-GEVAERT

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AGFA-GEVAERT

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816618 P 20030828

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI