Global patent index - EP 0997274 A1

EP 0997274 A1 2000-05-03 - Printing machine having disengageable blanket cylinders

Title (en)

Printing machine having disengageable blanket cylinders

Title (de)

Druckmaschine mit abstellbaren Gummituchzylindern

Title (fr)

Machine à imprimer avec des cylindres porte-blanchet escamotables

Publication

EP 0997274 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118035 A

Priority

US 17624298 A

Abstract (en)

The offset printer has a first (10) plate cylinder on which is placed a first (12) rubber blanket cylinder against which is placed a counter-pressure cylinder (14) leaving a printing gap between them. A pressure element (3) acting on the first plate cylinder and the counter-pressure cylinder exerts compressive force on the first cylinder and counter-pressure cylinder to move the cylinders towards each other. A wedge (7) produces a gap between the first rubber blanket cylinder and the counter-pressure cylinder during changeover between printing plates. The first rubber blanket cylinder is mounted by one end (12a) in a first housing (112), and the counter-pressure cylinder is mounted by one end (14a) in a housing (114). The wedge moves between the first rubber blanket cylinder housing and the counter-pressure cylinder housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Offsetdruckmaschine mit einem ersten Plattenzylinder (10), einem an den ersten Plattenzylinder (10) anstellbaren ersten Gummituchzylinder (12), einem mit dem ersten Gummituchzylinder (12) einen Druckspalt bildenden Gegendruckzylinder (14) und einem Keil (7), mittels dessen der erste Gummituchzylinder (12) wahlweise von dem Gegendruckzylinder (14) im Abstand gehalten werden kann. Der Gegendruckzylinder (14) kann als ein zweiter Gummituchzylinder ausgebildet sein, der einem zweiten Plattenzylinder (16) zugeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/36; B41F 13/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01); B41F 13/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19945243 A1 20000427; EP 0997274 A1 20000503; JP 2000127334 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status

2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI