Global Patent Index - EP 0997301 A2

EP 0997301 A2 2000-05-03 - Infrared foil heater for drying ink jet images on a recording medium

Title (en)

Infrared foil heater for drying ink jet images on a recording medium

Title (de)

Infrarotfolienheizung zum Trocknen von Tintenstrahlabbildungen auf einem Aufzeichnungsträger

Title (fr)

Feuille infrarouge chauffante pour sécher des images jet d'encre sur un support d'enregistrement

Publication

EP 0997301 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308175 A

Priority

US 18278898 A

Abstract (en)

A heater (50) is disposed in a post-print location of an ink printer (10) to provide a post-print drying of an ink image formed on a recording medium (16). The heater (50) includes a foil circuit (52) made of a material which, when receiving an applied power from a power source (56), emits radiation in the infrared range. The heater (50) is located above the paper path and presents a rapid uniform application of IR radiation to predetermined areas of the recorded image resulting in fast, efficient drying of the image and enabling a high productivity printer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997301 A2 20000503; EP 0997301 A3 20000712; BR 9905337 A 20000905; JP 2000135785 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020222

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI