Global Patent Index - EP 0997313 A1

EP 0997313 A1 2000-05-03 - Rubber stamp element and production method thereof

Title (en)

Rubber stamp element and production method thereof

Title (de)

Gummistempel und Herstellungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Tampon en caoutchouc et méthode de fabrication de celui-ci

Publication

EP 0997313 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121387 A

Priority

JP 31101098 A

Abstract (en)

A rubber stamp element is composed of, at least, two layers, i.e. a continuous-foam sponge rubber layer and a rubber layer, wherein the continuous-foam sponge rubber layer has a spring hardness of 15 to 35. This rubber stamp element is produced by the steps of: laying an unvulcanized rubber sheet (A) having a rubber composition including raw rubber, a vulcanizing agent and a filler, over another unvulcanized rubber sheet (B) having a sponge-type rubber composition including raw rubber, a vulcanizing agent, a filler and a water-soluble powder; heating and compressing them so as to be integrated; making the rubber layer (B) porous by treating the integrated structure with water; and carving the surface of either the (A) layer or the (B) layer of the integrated structure using a laser beam. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 1/00; B41C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 3/04 (2006.01); B41M 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 3/04 (2013.01); B41M 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997313 A1 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021017

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI