Global Patent Index - EP 0997317 A1

EP 0997317 A1 2000-05-03 - A lithographic base for use in non-impact printing

Title (en)

A lithographic base for use in non-impact printing

Title (de)

Lithographischer Träger für anschlagloses Drucken

Title (fr)

Support lithographique pour l'impression sans frappe

Publication

EP 0997317 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203608 A

Priority

EP 98203608 A

Abstract (en)

According to the present invention there is provided a lithographic base comprising a support and a hydrophilic layer thereon containing a hydrophilic binder , TiO 2 particles and wherein said layer is cross-linked, characterized in that the total volume of pores of said lithographic base is more than 0.0007 cm <3> /g.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 1/06 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); B41N 3/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997317 A1 20000503; EP 0997317 B1 20031008; DE 69818827 D1 20031113; DE 69818827 T2 20040812; JP 2000127645 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131026

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69818827

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131026

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120802

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69818827 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-08 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI